+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (75)
On April 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0774)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 774 (effective 7/1/97)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading of Governor's communication waived
- VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (38-Y 1-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's rec. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 1-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB675ER)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On March 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB675ER)
On February 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 978340749-S3
On February 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by conference committee
On February 21, 1997 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 4-N)
On February 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 978340749-S3
- VOTE: CONFERENCE COMMITTEE RPT (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONFERENCE COMM. (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Whipple, Houck, Williams
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Moore, Darner, Wardrup
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (0-Y 40-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed by temporarily
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 977958360-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N)
- Passed House with substitute (97-Y 3-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 977958360-H1
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 977958360-H1
- Reported from Tra. w/sub. (21-Y 1-N)
On February 11, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 3
On February 6, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 5, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 972479749-S2
- Read second time
- Committee substitute reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 972474749-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 972479749-S2
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 972474749-S1
- Committee substitute printed 972474749-S1
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Transportation
- Motion for recommittal to committee agreed to
On January 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 972474749-S1-rejected
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/97 978161749
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (14)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (38-Y 1-N)
February 21, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 4-N)
February 21, 1997: VOTE: CONFERENCE COMMITTEE RPT (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: ACCEDE CONFERENCE COMM. (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1997: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (0-Y 40-N)
February 17, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N)
February 13, 1997: Reported from Tra. w/sub. (21-Y 1-N)
February 3, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1997: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1997: Reported from Transportation w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
January 24, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
January 23, 1997: Reported from Transportation w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor