+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB672E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 14103978D-E
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 14103978D
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 24, 2014: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 10, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2014: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2014: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor