+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On February 13, 1995 in the House:
- No action taken by Finance by voice vote
- Incorporated in other legislation (SB0721)
On February 10, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Trans/Spec Grants
On January 11, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed LD4627733
+ − Votes (5)
February 3, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor