+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0605)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 605 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB672ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 20108619D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108619D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB672H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20108619D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101888D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 25, 2020: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2020: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2020: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
T. Montgomery "Monty" Mason
Type:
Primary Sponsor