+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 782 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB672ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101776D
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor