+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
On March 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 4 (effective 7/1/98)
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB67ER)
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (29-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 987249809-E
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 987249809
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (29-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor