+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812)
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 812 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB669ER)
On March 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 1-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- Passed House with substitute (84-Y 7-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 025605568-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 025605568-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 7-N)
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 025605568-H1
On February 28, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from C. & L. with substitute (17-Y 3-N)
On February 13, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 025485568-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 025485568-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 025485568-S1
On February 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 021341568
+ − Votes (6)
March 6, 2002: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 1-N)
March 5, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 7-N)
February 28, 2002: Reported from C. & L. with substitute (17-Y 3-N)
February 8, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2002: Reported from C. & L. with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor