+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0644)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 644 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB669ER)
- Enrolled
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 14105301D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (36-Y 2-N)
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB669H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105301D-H1
- Read third time
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14105301D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB669S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104339D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104339D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 14104233D
+ − Votes (7)
March 4, 2014: House substitute agreed to by Senate (36-Y 2-N)
February 28, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2014: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2014: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor