+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (61)
On April 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0853)
On April 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (34-Y 5-N)
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 853 (effective - see bill)
On April 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (35-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (35-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (34-Y 5-N)
- Rec. of Gov's recommendation agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- Pending question ordered
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (67-Y 30-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (67-Y 30-N)
On April 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB668ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Governor's substitute printed 028764211-S2
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 3, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB668ER)
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- Amendments by Del. Wardrup rejected (37-Y 56-N)
- Committee substitute rejected 023345880-H1 (31-Y 68-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (31-Y 68-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: REJECTED (37-Y 56-N)
- Passed House (56-Y 42-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 42-N)
- Pending question ordered
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed 023345880-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub (20-Y 5-N)
On February 25, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Finance with sub (15-Y 7-N)
On February 20, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 023158568-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Sen. Williams agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee sub w/amds 023158568-ES1
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (27-Y 13-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (25-Y 15-N)
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed 023158568-ES1
On February 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 5-N 1-A)
- Committee substitute printed 023158568-S1
On January 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 023092568
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (14)
April 17, 2002: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (34-Y 5-N)
April 17, 2002: VOTE: ADOPTION (67-Y 30-N)
April 17, 2002: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
April 17, 2002: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (35-Y 4-N)
February 27, 2002: VOTE: REJECTED (37-Y 56-N)
February 27, 2002: VOTE: REJECTED (31-Y 68-N)
February 27, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 42-N)
February 26, 2002: Reported from Appropriations with sub (20-Y 5-N)
February 25, 2002: Reported from Finance with sub (15-Y 7-N)
February 15, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (27-Y 13-N)
February 15, 2002: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (25-Y 15-N)
February 15, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 5-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor