+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 592 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0592)
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB664ER)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (99-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106927D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB664S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106927D-S1
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103701D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
+ − Votes (7)
March 1, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 26, 2018: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
February 21, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor