+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On December 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2015 in Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104814D-S1
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 14103861D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 6, 2014: Continued to 2015 in Finance (14-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2014: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor