+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 682 (effective - see bill)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0682)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB663ER)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105073D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB663S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18105073D-S1
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Education and Health
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103365D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor