+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 271 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB662ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
- Passed House (55-Y 44-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 9-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 13-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N)
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103500D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2020: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
February 18, 2020: Reported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 9-N)
January 31, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 13-N)
January 29, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Jennifer B. Boysko
Type:
Primary Sponsor