+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (7-Y 14-N)
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 987300809
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 1998: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (7-Y 14-N)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor