+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 642 (effective - see bill)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB658ER)
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB658H1
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105240D-H1
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced 14105240D-H1
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 14105240D-H1
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB658E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 14103900D-E
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 14103900D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 6, 2014: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2014: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2014: Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor