+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- Continued to 2001 in C. C. T. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 2
On February 17, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 005655444-E
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed 005655444