+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in Health, Welfare and Institutions (11-Y 9-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB654E
- Printed as engrossed 18103643D-E
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (11-Y 4-N)
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103643D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2018: Passed by indefinitely in Health, Welfare and Institutions (11-Y 9-N)
February 20, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N)
January 26, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N)
January 24, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (11-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor