+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 681 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0681)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB652ER)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute rejected 18106629D-S1
- Committee substitute rejected 18106915D-S2
- Floor substitute printed 18107002D-S3 (McPike)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senator McPike agreed to 18107002D-S3
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB652S3
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106915D-S2
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106629D-S1
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103802D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
+ − Votes (7)
March 6, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2018: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor