+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB649-Norment) by voice vote
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends incorporating (SB649-Norment) by voice vote
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Ethics
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Rules
- Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 14103397D
+ − Votes (4)
January 30, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2014: Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2014: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor