+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 680 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0680)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB651ER)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced 18107724D-H1
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107724D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB651H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107724D-H1
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104128D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
+ − Votes (8)
March 7, 2018: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2018: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N)
February 2, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor