+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 824 (effective 7/1/14)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
- VOTE: REJECTED (27-Y 66-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation (27-Y 66-N)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (20-Y 19-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB651ER)
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Ethics
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104432D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Petersen rejected (10-Y 30-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB651S1
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB220
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104432D-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Rules
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 14103396D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (11)
April 23, 2014: VOTE: REJECTED (27-Y 66-N)
April 23, 2014: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (20-Y 19-N)
February 28, 2014: House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
February 26, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
January 30, 2014: Amendment by Senator Petersen rejected (10-Y 30-N)
January 27, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2014: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2014: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor