+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Communicated to Governor
- Passed by for the day
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB650ER)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 14105139D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB650H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105139D-H1
- Read third time
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14105139D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Ethics
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Rules
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 14103395D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 3, 2014: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2014: Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2014: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor