+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (62)
On April 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0915)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 915 (effective 4/17/96)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation
- Amended as sub. by Gov's recommendation 964187812-S2
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 11-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (82-Y 11-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (24-Y 14-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (24-Y 14-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On April 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Governor's substitute printed 964187812-S2
On April 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB65ER)
On March 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE (38-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On February 28, 1996 in the House:
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N)
- Amendments by Mr. Croshaw agreed to
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amds. 968115180-H1
- Passed House with sub. with amendments (82-Y 15-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 968115180-H1
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Amendments by Mr. Croshaw reconsidered
- Amendments by Mr. Croshaw rejected
- Reengrossed by House as amended com. sub. 968115180-H1
- Passed House with substitute (75-Y 25-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (75-Y 25-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (19-Y 2-N)
- Committee substitute printed 968115180-H1
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 967278739-S1
- Emergency clause deleted
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 967278739-S1
- Passed Senate (35-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (34-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 3-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 3-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 967278739-S1
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (12-Y 1-N 2-A)
On January 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg clause 964302739