+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (96)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0804)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB649ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (93-Y 0-N)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 804 (effective - see bill)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB649ER)
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 14105640D-S3
- Amended by conference committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Delegates: Gilbert, Albo, McClellan
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senators: Norment, McEachin, Puckett
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute with amendment
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute with amendment (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB649H1
- Amendment by Delegate Gilbert agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105140D-H1
- Read third time
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Incorporates SB652
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14105140D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Ethics
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments 1-6 by Senator Garrett withdrawn
- Amendments 1, 2, 4, 7 and 9 by Senator Ebbin rejected
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Senator McEachin agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Senator Petersen agreed to (20-Y 20-N)
- Chair votes yes
- Reading of amendments 1, 2, 4, 7 and 9 waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB649ES1
- Motion to pass by for the day withdrawn
- Amendments 3 and 8 by Senator Ebbin withdrawn
- Reading of amendments 5, 6, 10 and 11 waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 14104393D-ES1
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Amendment 14 by Senator Ebbin rejected
- Reading of amendment 14 waived
- Amendments 12 and 13 by Senator Ebbin agreed to
- Reading of amendments 12 and 13 waived
- Amendments 5, 6, 10 and 11 by Senator Ebbin rejected
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104393D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senator Norment withdrawn 14104756D-S2
- Read second time
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Floor substitute printed 14104756D-S2 (Norment))
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104393D-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 14100967D
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (14)
April 23, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
April 23, 2014: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2014: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2014: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2014: House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
February 26, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 10, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: Amendments by Senator Petersen agreed to (20-Y 20-N)
January 27, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2014: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor