+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0596)
On April 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 596 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB648ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS R (40-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 14-N)
- Passed House with amendments (82-Y 14-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (17-Y 6-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 980804844-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (12-Y 1-N 2-A)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 980804844
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS R (40-Y 0-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 14-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from C. J. with amendments (17-Y 6-N)
February 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 1-N)
February 5, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (12-Y 1-N 2-A)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor