+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On December 4, 2014 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Continued to 2015 in Appropriations by voice vote
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104629D-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB647ES1
- Printed as engrossed 14104629D-ES1
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Committee substitute printed 14104629D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 14103174D
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2014: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2014: Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2014: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor