+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733)
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 733 (effective 4/27/22)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB647ER2)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (93-Y 4-N)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (93-Y 4-N)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB647ER)
- Enrolled
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 22107065D-H1
- Emergency clause added
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 22107065D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB647H1
- VOTE: Passage (97-Y 3-N)
- Passed House with substitute (97-Y 3-N)
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22107065D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB647E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Committee amendments rejected
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Committee amendments reconsidered (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On January 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 22104480D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (13)
April 27, 2022: VOTE: Adoption (93-Y 4-N)
April 27, 2022: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 27, 2022: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N)
March 4, 2022: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2022: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 3-N)
February 24, 2022: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2022: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2022: Committee amendments reconsidered (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2022: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 11, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2022: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor