+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 657 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0657)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB647ER)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB647E
- Printed as engrossed 18103371D-E
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103371D
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
+ − Votes (7)
March 6, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2018: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2018: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 5, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor