+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0942)
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 942 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 27, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB646ER)
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 7-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (91-Y 7-N)
On March 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Reid, Marshall, R.G., Johnson
On March 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senators: Potts, Howell, Watkins
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendment
On March 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: REJECT HOUSE AMENDMENT (16-Y 23-N)
- House amendment rejected by Senate (16-Y 23-N)
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Read third time
- Amendment by Del. Marshall, R.G. agreed to (53-Y 44-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: ADOPTION (53-Y 44-N)
- Passed House with amendment (94-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N)
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 045183108-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB646E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd (14-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 045183108
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (10)
March 12, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 7-N)
March 12, 2004: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2004: VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2004: VOTE: REJECT HOUSE AMENDMENT (16-Y 23-N)
March 4, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (53-Y 44-N)
March 4, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N)
March 2, 2004: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2004: Reported from General Laws with amd (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor