+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
- Read third time
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (15-Y 6-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N)
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB645S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20106982D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20106982D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 6-N)
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104696D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2020: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N)
February 20, 2020: Reported from General Laws with amendments (15-Y 6-N)
February 18, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N)
February 4, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
January 31, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Scott A. Surovell
Type:
Primary Sponsor