+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0099)
On March 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 99 (effective 3/6/97)
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB644ER)
On February 11, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 7, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On January 17, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 16, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1997 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 974694851-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Pres. & ord. printed w/emg. clause pref.09/26/96 974694851
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 11, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1997: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
January 16, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
January 14, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
January 13, 1997: Reported from C. & L. with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor