+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB644E
- Printed as engrossed 18102251D-E
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 4-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 2-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102251D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2018: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N)
February 8, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 4-N)
January 29, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor