+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 629 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB643ER)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101775D
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2018: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2018: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor