+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Continued to 2003 in Courts of Justice (21-Y 1-N)
On February 13, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 024725560-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Watkins agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee sub w/amd 024725560-ES1
- Printed as engrossed 024725560-ES1
On February 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 024725560-S1
On January 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Reported from R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Presented & ordered printed 024717560
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2002: Continued to 2003 in Courts of Justice (21-Y 1-N)
February 5, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2002: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2002: Reported from R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor