+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On April 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0773)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading of Governor's communication waived
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's rec. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 773 (effective 7/1/97)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB640ER)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On March 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB640ER)
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On February 11, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendments by Mr. Cranwell agreed to
- Read third time
On February 10, 1997 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
- Amendment by Mr. May agreed to
On February 7, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 6, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 970754749-E
On January 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amds. (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 07/15/96 970754749
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (10)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1997: Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 1997: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 16, 1997: Reported from Transportation w/amds. (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor