+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass in Senate
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Pending question ordered
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- No action taken prior to 12 Midnight on 3/4/98
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed 989674176-H1
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Floor Sub offered by Mr McClure 989782346-H2
- Floor substitute printed 989782346-H2 (McClure)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 989674176-H1 (65-Y 28-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 28-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989674176-H1
- Passed House with substitute (72-Y 21-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 21-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub. (21-Y 3-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected (18-Y 22-N)
- VOTE: COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE V (18-Y 22-N)
- Substitute by Sen. K. G. Miller offered
- Substitute by Sen. K. G. Miller withdrawn
- Floor substitute printed 985431713-S3 (Miller, K.G.)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Sen. Stosch agreed to 985433743-S2
- Floor substitute printed 985433743-S2 (Stosch)
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 985433743-S2
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Passed by temporarily
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 985429661-S1
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (9-Y 7-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 985340661
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (8)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 28-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 21-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance with sub. (21-Y 3-N)
February 18, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1998: VOTE: COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE V (18-Y 22-N)
February 18, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance with substitute (9-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor