+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0355)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 355 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB638ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB638S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105109D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 12105109D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 12103519D
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2012: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2012: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor