+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 16103417D
+ − Votes (3)
January 29, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2016: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor