+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Appropriations (15-Y 8-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 982233666-H1
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 1
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 2-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Education
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 988955666
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health