+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2013 in Privileges and Elections
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 20(g)
- Recommitted to Privileges and Elections
- Motion to recommit to committee agreed to
- Read second time
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Floor substitute printed 12105300D-S2 (Hanger)
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
- Committee substitute printed 12105102D-S1
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 12102384D