+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
On April 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 628 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB634ER)
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
- Passed House (93-Y 4-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
- Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 1-N)
On February 18, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reengrossed by Senate
- Read second time and engrossed
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 024433536
+ − Votes (7)
March 5, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
March 4, 2002: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 1-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2002: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor