+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627)
On April 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 627 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB633ER)
On March 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 1-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Reengrossed by Senate as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 024506420-E
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 024506420
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
March 6, 2002: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 1-N)
March 5, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2002: Reported from C. J. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2002: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor