+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0601)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 601 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB633ER)
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101954D
+ − Votes (7)
March 7, 2018: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2018: Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor