+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 640 (effective 7/1/14)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0640)
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB631ER)
- Enrolled
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 14103521D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB631E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented and ordered printed 14103521D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2014: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2014: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor