+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0803)
On April 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB630ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 803 (effective 7/1/98)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recom. (Block vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB630ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (39-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 986848236-H1
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 986848236-H1
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 986848236-H1
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 988511236-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 988511236
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (38-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1998: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor