+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On May 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0851)
On April 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 851 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB63ER)
On March 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- House amendments rejected by conference committee
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Reading of conference report waived
- Amended by conference committee
On March 10, 2000 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- Delegates: Jackson, Griffith, Shuler
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senators: Marye, Norment, Colgan
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
On March 8, 2000 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendments
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- House amendment No. 1 rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N 1-A)
- Reading of amendments waived
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (1-Y 37-N 1-A)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- House amendments No. 2-4 agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 3
On February 13, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 005207468-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 005207468-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 005207468-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 003334468
On January 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 003334468
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
March 10, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2000: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
March 9, 2000: VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
March 7, 2000: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (1-Y 37-N 1-A)
March 7, 2000: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
March 3, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2000: Reported from C. C. T. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 3, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2000: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor