+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0498)
On April 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 498 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB63ER)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 13, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 28, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor