+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)
On March 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 381 (effective 1/1/96)
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB629ER)
On February 29, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (95-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Emergency clause added
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 964616749-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 964616749
- VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
- Consent to introduce (37-Y 0-N)