+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and defeated by Senate (10-Y 30-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (7-Y 6-N)
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 14103098D
+ − Votes (3)
January 30, 2014: Read third time and defeated by Senate (10-Y 30-N)
January 27, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2014: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (7-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor