+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 669 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB629ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT R (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 9-N)
- Passed House with amendment (86-Y 9-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (16-Y 6-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 988512236
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT R (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 9-N)
March 6, 1998: Reported from C. J. with amendment (16-Y 6-N)
February 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor